TN SB0603 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 514
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 514
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, enacts the "Revenue Modernization Act." - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 20; Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 21; Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 7 and Title 67, Chapter 6.
Title
As enacted, enacts the "Revenue Modernization Act." - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 20; Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 21; Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 7 and Title 67, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Sen. Mark Norris [R] |
Roll Calls
2015-04-15 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-06-03 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 514 | |
2015-04-22 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/22/2015 |
2015-04-21 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/22/2015 |
2015-04-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/21/2015 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2015-04-15 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/15/2015 |
2015-04-14 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/15/2015 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee2 calendar for 4/14/2015 |
2015-04-13 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. on 4/14/15 |
2015-03-31 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee w/recommend, as amended |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/31/2015 |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee to 3/31/2015 |
2015-03-18 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/24/2015 |
2015-03-17 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee to 3/24/2015 |
2015-03-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/17/2015 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Refer to Senate Revenue Subcommittee |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-10 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0644 (Crossfiled) 2015-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 514