TN HB0644 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on June 3 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-06-03 - Pub. Ch. 514
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, enacts the "Revenue Modernization Act." - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 20; Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 21; Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 7 and Title 67, Chapter 6.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, enacts the "Revenue Modernization Act." - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 20; Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 21; Title 67, Chapter 4, Part 7 and Title 67, Chapter 6.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2015-04-22 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-22 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 4 (Y: 82 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-04-16 - House - FLOOR VOTE: AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 90 N: 3 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2015-06-03 Pub. Ch. 514
2015-06-03 Effective date(s) 05/20/2015; 07/01/2015; 01/01/2016; 07/01/2016
2015-05-20 Signed by Governor.
2015-05-08HouseTransmitted to Governor for his action.
2015-05-07SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2015-05-06HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2015-04-27HouseEnrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker.
2015-04-22HouseH. concurred in S. am. no. 4
2015-04-22HouseH. Placed on Message Calendar 2 for 4/22/2015
2015-04-22SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0
2015-04-22SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 4 - SA0467)
2015-04-22SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 3 - SA0463)
2015-04-22SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0460)
2015-04-22SenateAmendment withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - SA0451)
2015-04-22SenateSenate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill.
2015-04-21SenateReceived from House, Passed on First Consideration
2015-04-17HouseEngrossed; ready for transmission to Sen.
2015-04-16HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2015-04-16HousePassed H., as am., Ayes 90, Nays 3, PNV 0
2015-04-16HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 3 - HA0469)
2015-04-16HouseH. adopted am. (Amendment 2 - HA0439)
2015-04-16HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0438)
2015-04-15HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/16/2015
2015-04-15HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/15/2015
2015-04-14HouseRec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee
2015-04-08HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/14/2015
2015-04-07HouseAction def. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee to 4/14/2015
2015-04-01HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/7/2015
2015-03-31HouseAction def. in Finance, Ways & Means Committee to 4/7/2015
2015-03-25HousePlaced on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 3/31/2015
2015-03-25HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2015-03-25HouseRec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2015-03-25HouseRec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2015-03-18HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/25/2015
2015-02-12HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
2015-02-12HouseP2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2015-02-11HouseIntro., P1C.
2015-02-10HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0603 (Crossfiled) 2015-06-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 514

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback