TN SB0587 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Pub. Ch. 59
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Pub. Ch. 59
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes compensation for the members of the board of directors subject to certain conditions. - Amends TCA Title 45, Chapter 4.
Title
As enacted, authorizes compensation for the members of the board of directors subject to certain conditions. - Amends TCA Title 45, Chapter 4.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2013-03-07 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - S. C&L COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-03-04 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2013-02-26 - Senate - S. C&L COMM.: Recommended for passage w/amendments- refer to: S. Cal. Comm. (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2013-04-03 | House | Pub. Ch. 59 |
2013-04-03 | House | Effective date(s) 07/01/2013 |
2013-03-26 | House | Signed by Governor. |
2013-03-14 | House | Transmitted to Gov. for action. |
2013-03-12 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2013-03-12 | House | Signed by S. Speaker |
2013-03-07 | House | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Passed H., Ayes 95, Nays 0 |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Am. withdrawn.(Amendment 1 - HA0027) |
2013-03-07 | Senate | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Passed S. as am., Ayes 32, Nays 0 |
2013-03-04 | Senate | S. adopted am.(Amendment 1 of 0 - SA0030) |
2013-03-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar cal. for 3/4/2013 |
2013-03-01 | Senate | S. Placed on cal. for 3/4/2013 |
2013-02-26 | Senate | Rec. for pass. w/ am., ref. to S. Cal. Comm. Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2013-02-20 | Senate | Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 2/26/2013 |
2013-02-19 | Senate | Action Def. in S. C&L Comm. to 2/26/2013 |
2013-02-13 | Senate | Placed on S. C&L Comm. cal. for 2/19/2013 |
2013-02-06 | Senate | P2C, ref. to S. C&L Comm. |
2013-02-04 | Senate | Intro., P1C. |
2013-01-31 | Senate | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0258 (Crossfiled) 2013-04-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 59