TN HB0258 | 2013-2014 | 108th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on April 3 2013 - 100% progression
Action: 2013-04-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 59
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, authorizes compensation for the members of the board of directors subject to certain conditions. - Amends TCA Title 45, Chapter 4.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, authorizes compensation for the members of the board of directors subject to certain conditions. - Amends TCA Title 45, Chapter 4.

Sponsors


Roll Calls


History

DateChamberAction
2013-04-03HouseComp. became Pub. Ch. 59
2013-03-07HouseComp. SB subst.
2013-02-28HouseH. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/7/2013
2013-02-27HousePlaced on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 2/28/2013
2013-02-26HouseRec. for Pass. if Am. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee
2013-02-20HousePlaced on cal. Insurance and Banking Committee for 2/26/2013
2013-02-20HouseRec. for pass. if am. by s/c ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee
2013-02-13HousePlaced on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 2/20/2013
2013-02-13HouseAction Def. in s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee to 2/20/2013
2013-02-06HousePlaced on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 2/13/2013
2013-02-04HouseAssigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee
2013-01-31HouseP2C, ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee
2013-01-30HouseIntro., P1C.
2013-01-29HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0587 (Crossfiled) 2013-04-03 - Pub. Ch. 59

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback