TN SB0584 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Pub. Ch. 177
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, adds "aggravated sexual battery" to the list of offenses for which petitions and orders of the court in a delinquency proceeding that may be otherwise confidential and restricted as to who may inspect are opened to public inspection and their content are subject to disclosure to the public if the juvenile is 14 or more years of age at the time of the alleged act. - Amends TCA Title 37 and Title 40.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, adds "aggravated sexual battery" to the list of offenses for which petitions and orders of the court in a delinquency proceeding that may be otherwise confidential and restricted as to who may inspect are opened to public inspection and their content are subject to disclosure to the public if the juvenile is 14 or more years of age at the time of the alleged act. - Amends TCA Title 37 and Title 40.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2019-04-08 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 92 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-26 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2019-05-01 Pub. Ch. 177
2019-05-01 Effective date(s) 04/23/2019
2019-04-23SenateSigned by Governor.
2019-04-16SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2019-04-15HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2019-04-10SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2019-04-09SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2019-04-08HousePassed H., Ayes 92, Nays 0, PNV 0
2019-04-08HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0202)
2019-04-08HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2019-04-04HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2019-04-02SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2019-04-01SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 32, Nays 0
2019-04-01SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0164)
2019-03-28SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/1/2019
2019-03-26SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0
2019-03-20SenatePlaced on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/26/2019
2019-02-07SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-05SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0622 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 177

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback