TN SB0583 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-14 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes the board of mayor and alderman for the city of Kingsport to vest supervisory authority over the public library system with the city manager by a two-thirds majority vote. - Amends TCA Section 10-3-103.
Title
As introduced, authorizes the board of mayor and alderman for the city of Kingsport to vest supervisory authority over the public library system with the city manager by a two-thirds majority vote. - Amends TCA Section 10-3-103.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-14 | Senate | Withdrawn. |
2019-02-14 | Senate | Recalled from Senate State & Local Government Committee |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0625 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-14 - Withdrawn.