TN SB0581 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-03-15 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of s. Trans. Com.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, prohibits using cell phone while driving in an activated school zone; violation is Class C misdemeanor punishable by $50.00 fine only. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 8.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, prohibits using cell phone while driving in an activated school zone; violation is Class C misdemeanor punishable by $50.00 fine only. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 8.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2011-03-15 Assigned to Gen. Sub of s. Trans. Com.
2011-02-16 P2C, ref. to S. Trans Comm.
2011-02-14 Intro., P1C.
2011-02-10 Filed for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB0322 (Crossfiled) 2011-03-08 - Failed In s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback