TN SB0581 | 2009-2010 | 106th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 10 2009 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2009-02-12 - P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, requires notice be given to a parent before the parent is considered to have willfully failed to support or visit a child for purposes of termination of parental rights; and requires certain additional information be in a petition to terminate parental rights or the adoption petition. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 1.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, requires notice be given to a parent before the parent is considered to have willfully failed to support or visit a child for purposes of termination of parental rights; and requires certain additional information be in a petition to terminate parental rights or the adoption petition. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 1.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2009-02-12 P2C, ref. to S. Jud Comm.
2009-02-11 Intro., P1C.
2009-02-10 Filed for intro.

Same As/Similar To

HB0033 (Crossfiled) 2010-04-13 - Failed In: Children and Family Affairs Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback