TN SB0566 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-04 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-04 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, reduces the sales and use tax on food and food ingredients for human consumption except prepared food, alcoholic beverages, candy, dietary supplements, and tobacco, from 5.5% to 2.75% beginning January 1, 2012. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, reduces the sales and use tax on food and food ingredients for human consumption except prepared food, alcoholic beverages, candy, dietary supplements, and tobacco, from 5.5% to 2.75% beginning January 1, 2012. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Sen. Andy Berke [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-04 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. | |
2011-04-27 | Placed on S. Tax Sub Committee of F,W&M. cal. for 5/4/2011 | |
2011-03-01 | Ref. to S. Tax Sub Comm. | |
2011-02-14 | P2C, ref. to S. FW&M Comm. | |
2011-02-10 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-09 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0354 (Crossfiled) 2011-02-16 - Assigned to s/c General Sub of Finance
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0566&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/SB0566.pdf |