TN SB0545 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression
Action: 2019-02-07 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Pending: Senate Judiciary Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, eliminates the civil statute of limitation on child sexual abuse and the statutes of limitation on sexual offenses committed against children on or after July 1, 2019. - Amends TCA Title 28; Title 39 and Title 40.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, eliminates the civil statute of limitation on child sexual abuse and the statutes of limitation on sexual offenses committed against children on or after July 1, 2019. - Amends TCA Title 28; Title 39 and Title 40.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2019-02-07SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
2019-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-02-04SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0660 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-11 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback