TN HB0660 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-11 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2019 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2019-02-11 - Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, eliminates the civil statute of limitation on child sexual abuse and the statutes of limitation on sexual offenses committed against children on or after July 1, 2019. - Amends TCA Title 28; Title 39 and Title 40.
Title
As introduced, eliminates the civil statute of limitation on child sexual abuse and the statutes of limitation on sexual offenses committed against children on or after July 1, 2019. - Amends TCA Title 28; Title 39 and Title 40.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2019-02-07 | House | P2C, ref. to Judiciary |
2019-02-06 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2019-02-05 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0545 (Crossfiled) 2019-02-07 - Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=HB0660&ga=111 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/111/Bill/HB0660.pdf |