TN SB0536 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Failed in Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Failed on April 5 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-05 - Failed in Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the office of research and education accountability to study the Response to Instruction and Intervention framework and submit a report on its implementation in elementary schools to the members of the education committee of the senate and the education administration and planning committee of the house of representatives no later than July 1, 2018. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2; Title 49, Chapter 3; Title 49, Chapter 5 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Title
As introduced, requires the office of research and education accountability to study the Response to Instruction and Intervention framework and submit a report on its implementation in elementary schools to the members of the education committee of the senate and the education administration and planning committee of the house of representatives no later than July 1, 2018. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 1; Title 49, Chapter 2; Title 49, Chapter 3; Title 49, Chapter 5 and Title 49, Chapter 6.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Failed in Senate Education Committee (Y: 4 N: 4 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | Senate | Failed in Senate Education Committee |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/5/2017 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Education Committee to 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/29/2017 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0449 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-10 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration