TN SB0535 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 373
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 7-0)
Status: Passed on May 18 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-18 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 373
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises the definition of abandonment for purposes of termination of parental rights to include circumstances where the parent or guardian fails to visit or support the child for a period of three consecutive months if the child is less than four years of age. - Amends TCA Title 36, Chapter 1; Title 37, Chapter 5 and Title 68, Chapter 11.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 36, Chapter 1; Title 37, Chapter 5 and Title 68, Chapter 11, relative to children.
Sponsors
Sen. Ferrell Haile [R] | Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] | Sen. Adam Lowe [R] | Sen. Becky Massey [R] |
Sen. Shane Reeves [R] | Sen. Dawn White [R] | Sen. Paul Rose [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-03-14 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 6 N: 2 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-18 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 373 | |
2023-04-17 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/17/2023 |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-04-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/13/2023 |
2023-04-10 | Senate | Senate Reset on calendar for 4/13/2023 |
2023-04-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/10/2023 |
2023-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/6/2023 |
2023-03-30 | Senate | Re-refer to S. Cal Comm |
2023-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/30/2023 |
2023-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/27/2023 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/14/2023 |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-03-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Judiciary Committee to 3/14/2023 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 3/13/2023 |
2023-02-07 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-02-03 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-01-31 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0163 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-18 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2023