TN SB0529 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-18 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. FW&M Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-05-18 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. FW&M Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, deletes obsolete language for spring sales tax holiday. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Title
As introduced, deletes obsolete language for spring sales tax holiday. - Amends TCA Title 67.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-05-18 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of: S. FW&M Comm. | |
2011-05-18 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm.2 cal. for 5/18/2011 | |
2011-05-17 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 5/18/2011 | |
2011-05-11 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 5/17/2011 | |
2011-05-10 | Action Def. in S. FW&M Comm. to 5/17/2011 | |
2011-05-04 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 5/10/2011 | |
2011-05-03 | Action def. in S. F,W&M Comm. to 5/10/11 | |
2011-04-27 | Placed on S. FW&M Comm. cal. for 5/3/2011 | |
2011-04-26 | Ref. to S. F,W&M | |
2011-04-26 | Recalled from S. Tax Sub Comm. | |
2011-03-01 | Ref. to S. Tax Sub Comm. | |
2011-02-14 | P2C, ref. to S. FW&M Comm. | |
2011-02-10 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-09 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0136 (Crossfiled) 2011-05-18 - Action Def. in s/c Finance Subcommittee to 2012
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0529&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/SB0529.pdf |