TN SB0523 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Pub. Ch. 334
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Pub. Ch. 334
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, changes references to the professional relationship between physicians and advanced practice registered nurses and certified nurse practitioners from "supervisory" to "collaborative". - Amends TCA Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
As enacted, changes references to the professional relationship between physicians and advanced practice registered nurses and certified nurse practitioners from "supervisory" to "collaborative". - Amends TCA Title 63 and Title 68.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-17 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-04-05 - Senate - SENATE HEALTH AND WELFARE COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | Pub. Ch. 334 | |
2017-05-19 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2017 | |
2017-05-09 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2017-05-02 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2017-05-01 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-05-01 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2017-04-27 | House | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2017-04-27 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0494) |
2017-04-27 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2017-04-19 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2017-04-17 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0312) |
2017-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 4/17/2017 |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/29/2017 |
2017-03-08 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Health and Welfare Committee to 3/22/2017 |
2017-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Health and Welfare Committee calendar for 3/8/2017 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-07 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0756 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 334