TN HB0756 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 334
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 19 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-19 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 334
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, changes references to the professional relationship between physicians and advanced practice registered nurses and certified nurse practitioners from "supervisory" to "collaborative". - Amends TCA Title 63 and Title 68.
Title
As enacted, changes references to the professional relationship between physicians and advanced practice registered nurses and certified nurse practitioners from "supervisory" to "collaborative". - Amends TCA Title 63 and Title 68.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-19 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 334 | |
2017-04-27 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-27 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2017-04-20 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/27/2017 |
2017-04-19 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/20/2017 |
2017-04-18 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-04-12 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 4/18/2017 |
2017-04-12 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Health Committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 4/12/2017 |
2017-04-05 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 4/12/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Action Def. in s/c Health Subcommittee to 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/29/2017 |
2017-03-22 | House | Reset on Final cal. of Health Subcommittee |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on s/c cal Health Subcommittee for 3/22/2017 |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Health Subcommittee |
2017-02-13 | House | P2C, ref. to Health Committee |
2017-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-08 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0523 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-19 - Pub. Ch. 334