TN SB0507 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 406
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 24 2023 - 100% progression
Action: 2023-05-24 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 406
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes wineries and farm wine producers in this state to maintain copies of their licenses, permits, and other documents electronically for purposes of establishing compliance with the law; beginning July 1, 2024, authorizes wineries and farm wine producers that hold two or more licenses or permits to choose the expiration date for such licenses or permits within certain parameters. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 3.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 57, Chapter 3, relative to electronic storage of documents by wineries.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Powers [R] |
Roll Calls
2023-04-19 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2023-02-28 - Senate - SENATE STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-05-24 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 406 | |
2023-04-21 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2023-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/21/2023 |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/19/2023 |
2023-04-19 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. 4-19-23 |
2023-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/20/2023 |
2023-02-28 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2023-02-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/28/2023 |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Sponsor change. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1119 (Crossfiled) 2023-05-24 - Effective date(s) 05/11/2023, 07/01/2024