TN SB0507 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-12 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2021 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2021-03-12 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the workers' compensation bureau, instead of the employee misclassification advisory task force, to make recommendations to the general assembly regarding programs and services to be funded from the employee misclassification education and enforcement fund. - Amends TCA Title 50.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 50, relative to workers' compensation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-03-12 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce & Labor Committee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0521 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-10 - P2C, caption bill, held on desk - pending amdt.