TN SB0500 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 6-0)
Status: Passed on June 1 2022 - 100% progression
Action: 2022-06-01 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2022
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises dealer's deduction for accounting for and remitting sales tax for items sold during the period of time beginning July 1, 2022, and ending June 30, 2023. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6, Part 5.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 67, Chapter 6, Part 5, relative to compensation for certain costs incurred by dealers in accounting for and remitting sales and use taxes to the state.
Sponsors
Sen. Jon Lundberg [R] | Sen. Ken Yager [R] | Sen. Rusty Crowe [R] | Sen. John Stevens [R] |
Sen. Page Walley [R] | Sen. Bo Watson [R] |
Roll Calls
2022-04-27 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-27 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 91 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2022-04-26 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2022-06-01 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2022 | |
2022-06-01 | Pub. Ch. 1082 | |
2022-05-27 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2022-05-18 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2022-05-17 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2022-05-12 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2022-05-11 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2022-04-28 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-27 | House | Passed H., Ayes 91, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2022-04-27 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA1026) |
2022-04-27 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2022-04-27 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0962) |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar 2 for 4/27/2022 |
2022-04-26 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 11, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2022-04-25 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2022-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/26/2022 |
2022-03-15 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means w/ negative recommendation, as amended |
2022-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/15/2022 |
2021-02-23 | Senate | Refer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Revenue Subcommittee |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0536 (Crossfiled) 2022-06-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 1082