TN SB0486 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-23 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 9 2015 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2015-02-23 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #3) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, deletes provision regarding the appointing authority of the defunct Tennessee board for economic growth. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 70.
Title
As introduced, deletes provision regarding the appointing authority of the defunct Tennessee board for economic growth. - Amends TCA Title 4 and Title 70.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-02-23 | Senate | Withdrawn. |
2015-02-12 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1188 (Crossfiled) 2015-02-24 - Assigned to s/c Business and Utilities Subcommittee
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0486&ga=109 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/109/Bill/SB0486.pdf |