TN SB0484 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 4 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-04-09 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires governmental entities to utilize public bidding when purchasing insurance; requires governmental entities to make certain disclosures in the public bids. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 29 and Title 56.
Title
As introduced, requires governmental entities to utilize public bidding when purchasing insurance; requires governmental entities to make certain disclosures in the public bids. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 29 and Title 56.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-04-09 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2019-04-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/9/2019 |
2019-04-02 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 4/9/2019 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 4/2/2019 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/26/2019 |
2019-02-07 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0530 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-03 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Public Service & Employees Subcommittee of State Committee