TN SB0479 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-12 - Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, incorporates into the Uniform Commercial Code the amendments adopted by the Uniform Law Commission in 2022. - Amends TCA Title 47.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 47, relative to the uniform commercial code.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2024-03-12 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-12 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2024-03-08 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/12/2024 |
2024-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-06 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2024-01-30 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/6/2024 |
2024-01-23 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 2/6/2024 |
2024-01-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 1/23/2024 |
2024-01-09 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 1/23/2024 |
2024-01-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 1/9/2024 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee to first calendar of 2024 |
2023-03-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/14/2023 |
2023-01-30 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Sponsor change. |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0640 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-13 - Sponsor(s) Added.