TN HB0640 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Pending: House Business and Utilities Subcommittee Committee
Hearing: Mar 19 @ 12:00 pm in House Hearing Room III
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 26 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2024-03-13 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Pending: House Business and Utilities Subcommittee Committee
Hearing: Mar 19 @ 12:00 pm in House Hearing Room III
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, incorporates into the Uniform Commercial Code the amendments adopted by the Uniform Law Commission in 2022. - Amends TCA Title 47.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 47, relative to the uniform commercial code.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2024-03-13 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2024-03-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business & Utilities Subcommittee for 3/19/2024 |
2024-03-12 | House | No Action Taken |
2024-03-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business & Utilities Subcommittee for 3/12/2024 |
2024-02-13 | House | Def. to Special Calendar to be Published with Final Calendar in Business & Utilities Subcommittee |
2024-02-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business & Utilities Subcommittee for 2/13/2024 |
2024-01-30 | House | Action Def. in s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee to 2/13/2024 |
2024-01-24 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business & Utilities Subcommittee for 1/30/2024 |
2023-03-14 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee of Commerce Committee |
2023-03-08 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business & Utilities Subcommittee for 3/14/2023 |
2023-02-01 | House | Assigned to s/c Business & Utilities Subcommittee |
2023-02-01 | House | P2C, ref. to Commerce Committee |
2023-01-30 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2023-01-26 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0479 (Crossfiled) 2024-03-12 - Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 0