TN SB0466 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Introduced on January 25 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-22 - Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/29/2023
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Hearing: Mar 29 @ 12:30 pm in Cordell Hull Building
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, specifies that a teacher or other employee of a public school or LEA is not required to refer to a student using the student's preferred pronoun if the pronoun is not consistent with the student's biological sex; insulates a teacher or other employee of a public school or LEA from civil liability and adverse employment action for referring to a student using the pronoun that is consistent with the student's biological sex. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 6.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 6, relative to student pronouns.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2023-03-22SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/29/2023
2023-03-22SenateAction deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/29/2023
2023-03-15SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/22/2023
2023-03-15SenateAction deferred in Senate Education Committee to 3/22/2023
2023-03-08SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/15/2023
2023-01-31SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2023-01-30SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee
2023-01-26SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2023-01-25SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB1269 (Crossfiled) 2023-03-15 - Placed behind the budget

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback