TN SB0461 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Pub. Ch. 82
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 4-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Pub. Ch. 82
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, expands to include pharmacists in the prohibition on discrimination by managed health insurance issuers against optometrists, ophthalmologists, podiatrists, and chiropractors solely on the basis of their license or certification, if such providers are acting within the scope of their license or certification. - Amends TCA Section 56-32-129.
Title
As enacted, expands to include pharmacists in the prohibition on discrimination by managed health insurance issuers against optometrists, ophthalmologists, podiatrists, and chiropractors solely on the basis of their license or certification, if such providers are acting within the scope of their license or certification. - Amends TCA Section 56-32-129.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-06 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 5 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | Pub. Ch. 82 | |
2017-04-11 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2017 | |
2017-03-31 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2017-03-23 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2017-03-22 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-03-22 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-03-21 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2017-03-20 | House | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2017-03-20 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2017-03-09 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2017-03-03 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/6/2017 |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 2/28/2017 |
2017-02-14 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0405 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 82