TN SB0460 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 174
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on May 3 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-03 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 174
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, clarifies that the mounting or placement of a trailer hitch ball in front of a registration plate will not be considered when making a determination whether the registration plate is clearly visible. - Amends TCA Title 55, Chapter 4.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 55, Chapter 4, relative to registration plates.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-03-24 - Senate - TRANSPORTATION AND SAFETY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-03 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 174 | |
2021-03-29 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2021-03-25 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 3/29/2021 |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-03-17 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/24/2021 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0175 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-03 - Effective date(s) 04/20/2021