TN SB0460 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-05 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Ed. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 8 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-05 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Ed. Comm.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, authorizes the board of trustees to undertake certain endeavors in regard to foundations established to support the university. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 9, Part 1.
Title
As introduced, authorizes the board of trustees to undertake certain endeavors in regard to foundations established to support the university. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 9, Part 1.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-05 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. Ed. Comm. | |
2011-02-10 | P2C, ref. to S. Ed. Comm. | |
2011-02-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-08 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0463 (Crossfiled) 2012-02-01 - Withdrawn.
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0460&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/SB0460.pdf |