TN SB0458 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, removes the requirement that a home school student must be enrolled as a home school student for a full year to be eligible for certain state lottery scholarships; adds those who complete six credit hours of dual enrollment courses to be eligible for the Tennessee HOPE scholarship. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 4, relative to financial aid for home school students.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] | Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-03 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: Motion to Adopt (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-05-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-04-27 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 10 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2021-03-03 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-21 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2021 | |
2021-05-21 | Pub. Ch. 467 | |
2021-05-18 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2021-05-11 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2021-05-07 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2021-05-05 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2021-05-03 | House | Passed H., Ayes 86, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2021-05-03 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2021-05-03 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 30, Nays 0 |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar for 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-27 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/27/2021 |
2021-04-21 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/27/2021 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-20 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 4/21/2021 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 4/20/2021 |
2021-04-19 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in S. FW&M Comm. 4/20/21 |
2021-03-03 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-02-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/3/2021 |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0646 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 467