TN HB0646 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 467
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 21 2021 - 100% progression
Action: 2021-05-21 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 467
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, removes the requirement that a home school student must be enrolled as a home school student for a full year to be eligible for certain state lottery scholarships; adds those who complete six credit hours of dual enrollment courses to be eligible for the Tennessee HOPE scholarship. - Amends TCA Title 49, Chapter 4.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 49, Chapter 4, relative to financial aid for home school students.
Sponsors
Rep. Jeremy Faison [R] | Rep. Terri Lynn Weaver [R] | Rep. Michele Carringer [R] | Rep. Bryan Terry [R] |
Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] |
Roll Calls
2021-05-03 - House - FLOOR VOTE: CONSENT CALENDAR PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 86 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-05-21 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 467 | |
2021-05-03 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2021-05-03 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2021-04-26 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 5/3/2021 |
2021-04-26 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/26/2021 |
2021-04-22 | House | Action def. in Calendar & Rules Committee to 4/26/2021 |
2021-04-21 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/22/2021 |
2021-04-20 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2021-04-14 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways, and Means Committee for 4/20/2021 |
2021-04-14 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-04-07 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee for 4/14/2021 |
2021-03-31 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways, and Means Subcommittee |
2021-03-31 | House | Rec. for pass., ref. to Finance, Ways, and Means Committee |
2021-03-24 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration for 3/31/2021 |
2021-03-23 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Education Administration |
2021-03-17 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 3/23/2021 |
2021-03-09 | House | Action Def. in s/c Higher Education Subcommittee to Lottery Calendar |
2021-03-03 | House | Placed on s/c cal Higher Education Subcommittee for 3/9/2021 |
2021-02-20 | House | Assigned to s/c Higher Education Subcommittee |
2021-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration |
2021-02-10 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2021-02-08 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0458 (Crossfiled) 2021-05-21 - Effective date(s) 07/01/2021