TN SB0458 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 2-1)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Pub. Ch. 256
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As enacted, authorizes local education agencies and nonpublic schools to maintain opioid antagonists in schools. - Amends TCA Title 49 and Title 63.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As enacted, authorizes local education agencies and nonpublic schools to maintain opioid antagonists in schools. - Amends TCA Title 49 and Title 63.

Sponsors


Roll Calls

2017-04-20 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 87 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-16 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 27 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - SENATE FINANCE, WAYS, AND MEANS COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 11 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-22 - Senate - SENATE EDUCATION COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 7 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]

History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-11 Pub. Ch. 256
2017-05-11 Effective date(s) 07/01/2017
2017-05-02SenateSigned by Governor.
2017-04-26SenateTransmitted to Governor for action.
2017-04-25HouseSigned by H. Speaker
2017-04-24SenateSigned by Senate Speaker
2017-04-20SenateEnrolled and ready for signatures
2017-04-20HousePassed H., Ayes 87, Nays 0, PNV 0
2017-04-20HouseAm. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0080)
2017-04-20HouseSubst. for comp. HB.
2017-03-20HouseRcvd. from S., held on H. desk.
2017-03-16SenateEngrossed; ready for transmission to House
2017-03-16SenateSponsor(s) Added.
2017-03-16SenatePassed Senate as amended, Ayes 27, Nays 0
2017-03-16SenateSenate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0037)
2017-03-14SenatePlaced on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/16/2017
2017-03-07SenateRecommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee
2017-03-01SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 3/7/2017
2017-02-22SenateRecommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee Ayes 7, Nays 0 PNV 0
2017-02-22SenatePlaced on Senate Education Committee calendar for 2/22/2017
2017-02-13SenateRefer to Senate Education Committee
2017-02-13SenateRecalled from Senate Health & Welfare Committee
2017-02-09SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee
2017-02-08SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2017-02-06SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0448 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 256

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback