TN HB0448 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 256
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 5-0)
Status: Passed on May 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-05-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 256
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, authorizes local education agencies and nonpublic schools to maintain opioid antagonists in schools. - Amends TCA Title 49 and Title 63.
Title
As enacted, authorizes local education agencies and nonpublic schools to maintain opioid antagonists in schools. - Amends TCA Title 49 and Title 63.
Sponsors
Rep. John Forgety [R] | Rep. Patsy Hazlewood [R] | Rep. Kevin Brooks [R] | Rep. Cameron Sexton [R] |
Rep. Bryan Terry [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-05-11 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 256 | |
2017-04-20 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2017-04-20 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-13 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-13 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 4/20/2017 |
2017-04-12 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-12 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 4/13/2017 |
2017-04-11 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-04-05 | House | Placed on cal. Finance, Ways & Means Committee for 4/11/2017 |
2017-04-05 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-03-29 | House | Placed on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-29 | House | Assigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee |
2017-03-28 | House | Rec. for pass, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee |
2017-03-22 | House | Placed on cal. Health Committee for 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-14 | House | Rec. for pass, ref. to Health Committee |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on cal. Education Administration & Planning for 3/14/2017 |
2017-03-07 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Education Administration & Planning |
2017-03-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee for 3/7/2017 |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Education Administration & Planning Subcommittee |
2017-02-09 | House | P2C, ref. to Education Administration & Planning-- Health |
2017-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-06 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0458 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-11 - Pub. Ch. 256