TN SB0446 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 28 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, subject to local approval, grants the county legislative body broader authority to set compensation for county highway commissioners, rather than setting a specific compensation in the charter. - Amends Chapter 53 of the Private Acts of 1985.
Title
As introduced, subject to local approval, grants the county legislative body broader authority to set compensation for county highway commissioners, rather than setting a specific compensation in the charter. - Amends Chapter 53 of the Private Acts of 1985.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-31 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 30 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-28 | Comp. became Pr. Ch. 6 | |
2011-03-31 | Comp. HB Subst (sends SB to dead bill file) | |
2011-03-29 | Placed on Senate Local Bill Calendar cal. for 3/31/2011 | |
2011-02-10 | P2C held on desk. Local Bill | |
2011-02-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-08 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0347 (Crossfiled) 2011-04-28 - Pr. Ch. 6