TN HB0347 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - Pr. Ch. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 14 2011 - 100% progression
Action: 2011-04-28 - Pr. Ch. 6
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, subject to local approval, grants the county legislative body broader authority to set compensation for county highway commissioners, rather than setting a specific compensation in the charter. - Amends Chapter 53 of the Private Acts of 1985.
Title
As introduced, subject to local approval, grants the county legislative body broader authority to set compensation for county highway commissioners, rather than setting a specific compensation in the charter. - Amends Chapter 53 of the Private Acts of 1985.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2011-03-21 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 97 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2011-03-17 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Consent Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-15 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-17 - House - (VOICE VOTE) CALENDAR & RULES COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: House Consent Calendar 1 (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
2011-03-15 - House - (VOICE VOTE) STATE & LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage - refer to: Calendar & Rules Committee (Y: 0 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [FAIL]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-28 | Pr. Ch. 6 | |
2011-04-14 | Signed by Governor. | |
2011-04-06 | Transmitted to Governor for his action. | |
2011-04-06 | Signed by S. Speaker | |
2011-04-05 | Signed by H. Speaker | |
2011-03-31 | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. | |
2011-03-31 | Passed S., Ayes 30, Nays 0 | |
2011-03-31 | S. Subst. HB for comp. SB. | |
2011-03-24 | Rcvd. from H., P1C. | |
2011-03-21 | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. | |
2011-03-21 | Passed H., Ayes 97, Nays 0, PNV 1 | |
2011-03-17 | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/21/2011 | |
2011-03-16 | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/17/2011 | |
2011-03-15 | Rec. For Pass. ref. to: Calendar & Rules Committee | |
2011-03-09 | Placed on cal. State & Local Government Committee for 3/15/2011 | |
2011-02-10 | P2C, ref. to State & Local Government Committee | |
2011-02-09 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-07 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0446 (Crossfiled) 2011-04-28 - Comp. became Pr. Ch. 6