TN SB0437 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Pub. Ch. 88
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 14-0)
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Pub. Ch. 88
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises various provisions regarding when a health insurance entity can make, and when a health insurance entity is required to notify a provider of, changes in the provider's fee schedule. - Amends TCA Title 56, Chapter 7.
Title
As enacted, revises various provisions regarding when a health insurance entity can make, and when a health insurance entity is required to notify a provider of, changes in the provider's fee schedule. - Amends TCA Title 56, Chapter 7.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2017-03-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-13 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: THIRD CONSIDERATION AMENDED (Y: 33 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-03-07 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | Pub. Ch. 88 | |
2017-04-11 | Effective date(s) 01/01/2019 | |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2017-03-27 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2017-03-23 | House | Passed H., Ayes 93, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2017-03-23 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - HA0083) |
2017-03-23 | House | Am. withdrawn. (Amendment 1 - HA0045) |
2017-03-23 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2017-03-16 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Amendment withdrawn. (Amendment 2 - SA0081) |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0068) |
2017-03-13 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-09 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/13/2017 |
2017-03-07 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/7/2017 |
2017-03-06 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in Senate Commerce & Labor Committee 3/7/2017 |
2017-02-09 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0498 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 88