TN HB0498 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-3)
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 88
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Moderate Partisan Bill (Republican 13-3)
Status: Passed on April 11 2017 - 100% progression
Action: 2017-04-11 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 88
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, revises various provisions regarding when a health insurance entity can make, and when a health insurance entity is required to notify a provider of, changes in the provider's fee schedule. - Amends TCA Title 56, Chapter 7.
Title
As enacted, revises various provisions regarding when a health insurance entity can make, and when a health insurance entity is required to notify a provider of, changes in the provider's fee schedule. - Amends TCA Title 56, Chapter 7.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-11 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 88 | |
2017-03-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-23 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2017-03-16 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/23/2017 |
2017-03-15 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/16/2017 |
2017-03-14 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2017-03-08 | House | Placed on cal. Insurance and Banking Committee for 3/14/2017 |
2017-03-08 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee |
2017-03-06 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-01 | House | Placed on s/c cal Insurance and Banking Subcommittee for 3/8/2017 |
2017-02-14 | House | Assigned to s/c Insurance and Banking Subcommittee |
2017-02-09 | House | P2C, ref. to Insurance and Banking Committee |
2017-02-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2017-02-06 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0437 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-11 - Pub. Ch. 88