TN SB0433 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-11 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 5 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-02-11 - Withdrawn.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, specifies that the county mayor, in unincorporated areas, and the highest-ranking elected official in a city in the official's jurisdiction, have the authority to establish and implement health policies that affect the county or city, as applicable, during a health emergency; directs the county health director, health officer, and board of health to provide advice to the mayor and city official to develop the policies; applies only in Shelby, Davidson, Knox, Hamilton, Sullivan, and Madison counties. - Amends TCA Title 5 and Title 68, Chapter 2, Part 6.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 5 and Title 68, Chapter 2, Part 6, relative to public health emergencies.
Sponsors
Sen. Paul Rose [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-02-11 | Senate | Withdrawn. |
2021-02-11 | Senate | Recalled from Senate Health & Welfare Committee |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Health and Welfare Committee |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-02-05 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0391 (Crossfiled) 2021-02-11 - Withdrawn.