TN SB0433 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 210
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 2-0)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 210
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits a county or municipality from requiring a license, fee, permit, or other form of regulation for a business that is operated solely by a person under 18 years of age, is located on private property with the property owner's permission, and generates gross receipts of contributions of $3,000 or less in a calendar year. - Amends TCA Title 5, Chapter 1, Part 1 and Title 6, Chapter 54, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, prohibits a county or municipality from requiring a license, fee, permit, or other form of regulation for a business that is operated solely by a person under 18 years of age, is located on private property with the property owner's permission, and generates gross receipts of contributions of $3,000 or less in a calendar year. - Amends TCA Title 5, Chapter 1, Part 1 and Title 6, Chapter 54, Part 1.
Sponsors
Sen. Mike Bell [R] | Sen. John Stevens [R] |
Roll Calls
2019-03-26 - Senate - SENATE COMMERCE AND LABOR COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 (Y: 9 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 210 | |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Companion House Bill substituted |
2019-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar for 4/1/2019 |
2019-03-26 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 9, Nays 0 PNV 0 |
2019-03-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-12 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/26/2019 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/12/2019 |
2019-03-05 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to 3/12/2019 |
2019-02-26 | Senate | Placed on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 3/5/2019 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-31 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0012 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-01 - Pub. Ch. 210