TN HB0012 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-5)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Pub. Ch. 210
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 15-5)
Status: Passed on May 1 2019 - 100% progression
Action: 2019-05-01 - Pub. Ch. 210
Text: Latest bill text (Chaptered) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, prohibits a county or municipality from requiring a license, fee, permit, or other form of regulation for a business that is operated solely by a person under 18 years of age, is located on private property with the property owner's permission, and generates gross receipts of contributions of $3,000 or less in a calendar year. - Amends TCA Title 5, Chapter 1, Part 1 and Title 6, Chapter 54, Part 1.
Title
As enacted, prohibits a county or municipality from requiring a license, fee, permit, or other form of regulation for a business that is operated solely by a person under 18 years of age, is located on private property with the property owner's permission, and generates gross receipts of contributions of $3,000 or less in a calendar year. - Amends TCA Title 5, Chapter 1, Part 1 and Title 6, Chapter 54, Part 1.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2019-04-10 - House - FLOOR VOTE: MESSAGE CALENDAR CONCUR IN SENATE AMENDMENT # 1 (Y: 93 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-04-01 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: as Amended Third Consideration (Y: 32 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2019-03-14 - House - FLOOR VOTE: REGULAR CALENDAR AS AMENDED PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 95 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-05-01 | Pub. Ch. 210 | |
2019-05-01 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2019 | |
2019-04-23 | Signed by Governor. | |
2019-04-16 | House | Transmitted to Governor for his action. |
2019-04-15 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2019-04-11 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2019-04-10 | House | Enrolled; ready for sig. of H. Speaker. |
2019-04-10 | House | H. concurred in S. am. no. 1 Ayes 93, Nays 0 PNV 0 HB0012 |
2019-04-08 | House | H. Placed on Message Calendar for 4/10/19 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Passed Senate as amended, Ayes 33, Nays 0 |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Senate adopted Amendment (Amendment 1 - SA0169) |
2019-04-01 | Senate | Senate substituted House Bill for companion Senate Bill. |
2019-03-18 | Senate | Received from House, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-03-14 | House | Engrossed; ready for transmission to Sen. |
2019-03-14 | House | Passed H., as am., Ayes 95, Nays 0, PNV 0 |
2019-03-14 | House | H. adopted am. (Amendment 1 - HA0046) |
2019-03-07 | House | H. Placed on Regular Calendar for 3/14/2019 |
2019-03-06 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/7/2019 |
2019-03-05 | House | Rec. for pass. if am., ref. to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2019-02-27 | House | Placed on cal. Commerce Committee for 3/5/2019 |
2019-02-26 | House | Rec for pass if am by s/c ref. to Commerce Committee |
2019-02-20 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business Subcommittee for 2/26/2019 |
2019-02-19 | House | Taken off notice for cal in s/c Business Subcommittee of Commerce Committee |
2019-02-13 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business Subcommittee for 2/19/2019 |
2019-02-12 | House | Action Def. in s/c Business Subcommittee to 2/19/2019 |
2019-02-06 | House | Placed on s/c cal Business Subcommittee for 2/12/2019 |
2019-01-22 | House | Assigned to s/c Business Subcommittee |
2019-01-10 | House | Ref. to Commerce Committee |
2019-01-09 | House | P2C held on desk. |
2019-01-08 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2018-12-20 | House | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
SB0433 (Crossfiled) 2019-05-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 210