TN SB0373 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-08 - Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to first calendar of 2024
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 24 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-08 - Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to first calendar of 2024
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, establishes the office of rail and public transportation within the department; requires, among other duties and responsibilities, the office to determine present and future needs for, and economic feasibility of providing, public transportation and the retention, improvement, and addition of passenger and freight rail transportation in this state. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 54, Chapter 1; Title 64 and Title 65.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 4; Title 54, Chapter 1; Title 64 and Title 65, relative to transportation.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-08 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate Transportation and Safety Committee to first calendar of 2024 |
2023-03-01 | Senate | Placed on Senate Transportation and Safety Committee calendar for 3/8/2023 |
2023-01-26 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2023-01-25 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0598 (Crossfiled) 2024-01-24 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Transportation Subcommittee of Transportation Committee