TN SB0373 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 30 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2019-03-20 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee
Pending: Senate Education Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, reduces, from 30 percent to 15 percent, the portion of a teacher's evaluation that must be comprised of student achievement data, if the teacher does not have access to individual data representative of student growth; allows the teacher to decide whether an additional 15 percent of the evaluation is based on student growth and represented by TVAAS evaluation composites; specifies that the qualitative portion must be increased to account for the remainder of the teacher's evaluation. - Amends TCA Section 49-1-302.
Title
As introduced, reduces, from 30 percent to 15 percent, the portion of a teacher's evaluation that must be comprised of student achievement data, if the teacher does not have access to individual data representative of student growth; allows the teacher to decide whether an additional 15 percent of the evaluation is based on student growth and represented by TVAAS evaluation composites; specifies that the qualitative portion must be increased to account for the remainder of the teacher's evaluation. - Amends TCA Section 49-1-302.
Sponsors
Sen. Art Swann [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2019-03-20 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Education Committee |
2019-03-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate Education Committee calendar for 3/20/2019 |
2019-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Education Committee |
2019-02-04 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2019-01-30 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0066 (Crossfiled) 2019-01-28 - Assigned to s/c Curriculum, Testing, & Innovation Subcommittee
HB0467 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 28
HB0467 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-01 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 28