TN SB0350 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-05-08 - Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/9/2017
Pending: Senate Finance, Ways and Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, exempts certain sales of paper money and gold, silver, platinum, and palladium coins and bullion from the sales and use tax. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, exempts certain sales of paper money and gold, silver, platinum, and palladium coins and bullion from the sales and use tax. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2017-05-08SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/9/2017
2017-05-03SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/8/2017
2017-05-03SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/3/2017
2017-05-02SenateAction deferred in Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee to 5/3/2017
2017-05-01SenatePlaced on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/2/2017
2017-03-15SenateRefer to Senate Finance, Ways & Means Committee w/ recommendation
2017-03-10SenatePlaced on Senate FW&M Revenue Subcommittee calendar for 3/15/2017
2017-02-21SenateRefer to Senate Revenue Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2017-02-08SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee
2017-02-06SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2017-02-02SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0342 (Crossfiled) 2018-02-14 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback