TN HB0342 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Republican 3-1)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2018-02-14 - Taken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, exempts certain sales of paper money and gold, silver, platinum, and palladium coins and bullion from the sales and use tax. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Professional trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, exempts certain sales of paper money and gold, silver, platinum, and palladium coins and bullion from the sales and use tax. - Amends TCA Title 67, Chapter 6.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2018-02-14HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2018-02-07HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 2/14/2018
2018-02-07HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 2/14/2018
2018-01-31HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 2/7/2018
2018-01-31HouseAction Def. in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee to 2/7/2018
2018-01-24HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 1/31/2018
2017-05-08HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2017-05-03HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/8/2017
2017-04-26HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 5/2/2017
2017-03-29HousePlaced behind the budget
2017-03-27HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/29/2017
2017-03-15HouseTaken off notice for cal in s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee of Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2017-03-08HousePlaced on s/c cal Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee for 3/15/2017
2017-02-27HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-02-14HouseAssigned to s/c Finance, Ways & Means Subcommittee
2017-02-09HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-02-06HouseP2C, ref. to Finance, Ways & Means Committee
2017-02-02HouseIntro., P1C.
2017-02-01HouseSponsor(s) Added.
2017-02-01HouseFiled for intro.

Same As/Similar To

SB0350 (Crossfiled) 2017-05-08 - Placed on Senate Finance, Ways, and Means Committee calendar for 5/9/2017

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments

feedback