TN SB0322 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-05 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-04-05 - Sponsor(s) Added.
Pending: Senate Calendar Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, requires the joint legislative services committee to publish on the general assembly website the floor voting record of each member following the conclusion of each annual or extraordinary session of the general assembly. - Amends TCA Title 3.
Title
As introduced, requires the joint legislative services committee to publish on the general assembly website the floor voting record of each member following the conclusion of each annual or extraordinary session of the general assembly. - Amends TCA Title 3.
Sponsors
Sen. Lee Harris [D] | Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] | Sen. Ken Yager [R] |
Roll Calls
2017-04-05 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 1 (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2017-02-28 - Senate - SENATE STATE AND LOCAL GOVERNMENT COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-04-05 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-04-05 | Senate | Recommended for passage with amendment/s, refer to Senate Calendar Committee Ayes 8, Nays 0 PNV 1 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/5/2017 |
2017-04-04 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/5/2017 |
2017-03-29 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/4/2017 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-28 | Senate | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Rule #83(8) Suspended, to be heard in Senate State & Local Government Committee 3/28/2017 |
2017-03-27 | Senate | Re-refer to Senate S&L Govt. Comm. |
2017-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate Regular Calendar calendar for 3/27/2017 |
2017-02-28 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2017-02-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 2/28/2017 |
2017-02-08 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1186 (Crossfiled) 2017-04-12 - Failed in s/c State Government Subcommittee of State Government Committee