TN SB0316 | 2011-2012 | 107th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-14 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. S&L Govt. Com.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 2 2011 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2011-04-14 - Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. S&L Govt. Com.
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, creates an additional class of licenses allowing the sale of wine at certain retail food stores; requires person purchasing wine at certain retail food stores to present photo identification. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 1 and Title 57, Chapter 3.
Title
As introduced, creates an additional class of licenses allowing the sale of wine at certain retail food stores; requires person purchasing wine at certain retail food stores to present photo identification. - Amends TCA Title 57, Chapter 1 and Title 57, Chapter 3.
Sponsors
Sen. Bill Ketron [R] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2011-04-14 | Assigned to Gen. Sub of S. S&L Govt. Com. | |
2011-04-12 | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 4/19/2011 | |
2011-04-07 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 4/12/2011 | |
2011-03-29 | Action Def. in S. S&L Govt. Comm. to 4/12/2011 | |
2011-03-23 | Placed on S. S&L Govt. Comm. cal. for 3/29/2011 | |
2011-02-09 | P2C, ref. to S. S&L Govt. Comm. | |
2011-02-07 | Intro., P1C. | |
2011-02-02 | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
HB0406 (Crossfiled) 2011-04-13 - Action Def. in s/c S&LG Subcommittee to July 4,2012
Subjects
Tennessee State Sources
Type | Source |
---|---|
Summary | https://wapp.capitol.tn.gov/apps/Billinfo/default.aspx?BillNumber=SB0316&ga=107 |
Text | https://www.capitol.tn.gov/Bills/107/Bill/SB0316.pdf |