TN SB0311 | 2023-2024 | 113th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-28 - Deferred to Summer Study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 20 2023 - 25% progression
Action: 2023-03-28 - Deferred to Summer Study
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #2) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, makes gold and silver coinage legal tender; authorizes payment of taxes with gold and silver coinage; makes other changes concerning precious metals. - Amends TCA Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 9; Title 38; Title 45 and Title 67.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 5; Title 6; Title 7; Title 9; Title 38; Title 45 and Title 67, relative to precious metals.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2023-03-28 | Senate | Deferred to Summer Study |
2023-03-22 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-21 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 3/28/2023 |
2023-03-14 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/21/2023 |
2023-01-24 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2023-01-21 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2023-01-20 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB1481 (Crossfiled) 2023-04-18 - Returned to the Clerk's Desk.