TN SB0305 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-13 - Pub. Ch. 67
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Passed on April 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-13 - Pub. Ch. 67
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires a law enforcement officer to provide a minor suspected of prostitution with the telephone number of the Tennessee human trafficking resource center hotline instead of the number to the national hotline. - Amends TCA Title 39.
Title
As enacted, requires a law enforcement officer to provide a minor suspected of prostitution with the telephone number of the Tennessee human trafficking resource center hotline instead of the number to the national hotline. - Amends TCA Title 39.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-02 - Senate - FLOOR VOTE: MOTION TO ADOPT (Y: 31 N: 0 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
2015-02-24 - Senate - SENATE JUDICIARY COMMITTEE: Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee (Y: 8 N: 1 NV: 0 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-13 | Pub. Ch. 67 | |
2015-04-13 | Effective date(s) 07/01/2015 | |
2015-04-06 | Senate | Signed by Governor. |
2015-03-26 | Senate | Transmitted to Governor for action. |
2015-03-25 | House | Signed by H. Speaker |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Signed by Senate Speaker |
2015-03-24 | Senate | Enrolled and ready for signatures |
2015-03-23 | House | Passed H., Ayes 94, Nays 0, PNV 1 |
2015-03-23 | House | Subst. for comp. HB. |
2015-03-05 | House | Rcvd. from S., held on H. desk. |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Engrossed; ready for transmission to House |
2015-03-02 | Senate | Passed Senate, Ayes 31, Nays 0 |
2015-02-27 | Senate | Placed on Senate Consent Calendar 2 calendar for 3/2/2015 |
2015-02-24 | Senate | Recommended for passage, refer to Senate Calendar Committee |
2015-02-19 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/24/2015 |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Placed on Senate Judiciary Committee calendar for 2/17/2015 |
2015-02-11 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Judiciary Committee |
2015-02-09 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2015-02-02 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0270 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 67