TN HB0270 | 2015-2016 | 109th General Assembly
Status
Completed Legislative Action
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 67
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Spectrum: Slight Partisan Bill (Democrat 2-1)
Status: Passed on April 13 2015 - 100% progression
Action: 2015-04-13 - Comp. became Pub. Ch. 67
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As enacted, requires a law enforcement officer to provide a minor suspected of prostitution with the telephone number of the Tennessee human trafficking resource center hotline instead of the number to the national hotline. - Amends TCA Title 39.
Title
As enacted, requires a law enforcement officer to provide a minor suspected of prostitution with the telephone number of the Tennessee human trafficking resource center hotline instead of the number to the national hotline. - Amends TCA Title 39.
Sponsors
Roll Calls
2015-03-23 - House - FLOOR VOTE: PASSAGE ON THIRD CONSIDERATION (Y: 94 N: 0 NV: 1 Abs: 0) [PASS]
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2015-04-13 | Comp. became Pub. Ch. 67 | |
2015-03-23 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-23 | House | Comp. SB subst. |
2015-03-19 | House | H. Placed on Consent Calendar for 3/23/2015 |
2015-03-18 | House | Placed on cal. Calendar & Rules Committee for 3/19/2015 |
2015-03-16 | House | Sponsor(s) Added. |
2015-03-11 | House | Rec. for pass; ref to Calendar & Rules Committee |
2015-03-04 | House | Placed on cal. Criminal Justice Committee for 3/11/2015 |
2015-03-03 | House | Rec. for pass by s/c ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2015-02-25 | House | Placed on s/c cal Criminal Justice Subcommittee for 3/3/2015 |
2015-02-11 | House | Assigned to s/c Criminal Justice Subcommittee |
2015-02-11 | House | P2C, ref. to Criminal Justice Committee |
2015-02-09 | House | Intro., P1C. |
2015-02-03 | House | Filed for intro. |
Same As/Similar To
SB0305 (Crossfiled) 2015-04-13 - Pub. Ch. 67