TN SB0291 | 2017-2018 | 110th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Democrat 1-0)
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-14 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation & Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on February 1 2017 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2017-03-14 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation & Safety Committee
Pending: Senate Transportation and Safety Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, directs one-third of revenue from any increase in gasoline tax to be deposited in the highway fund and used solely for public transportation. - Amends TCA Title 9; Title 54 and Title 67.
Title
As introduced, directs one-third of revenue from any increase in gasoline tax to be deposited in the highway fund and used solely for public transportation. - Amends TCA Title 9; Title 54 and Title 67.
Sponsors
Sen. Jeff Yarbro [D] |
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2017-03-14 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Transportation & Safety Committee |
2017-02-06 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Transportation and Safety Committee |
2017-02-02 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2017-02-01 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0352 (Crossfiled) 2017-02-14 - Assigned to s/c Transportation Subcommittee