TN SB0244 | 2019-2020 | 111th General Assembly

Status

Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 29 2019 - 25% progression, died in committee
Action: 2020-01-14 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Pending: Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]

Summary

As introduced, allows the comptroller of the treasury to report any annual actuarial study of the medical assistance program and any participating managed care organizations and associated comments in electronic format to the finance, ways and means committees of the senate and the house of representatives, the office of legislative budget analysis, and the fiscal review committee of the general assembly. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 56 and Title 71.

Tracking Information

Register now for our free OneVote public service or GAITS Pro trial account and you can begin tracking this and other legislation, all driven by the real-time data of the LegiScan API. Providing tools allowing you to research pending legislation, stay informed with email alerts, content feeds, and share dynamic reports. Use our new PolitiCorps to join with friends and collegaues to monitor & discuss bills through the process.

Monitor Legislation or view this same bill number from multiple sessions or take advantage of our national legislative search.

Title

As introduced, allows the comptroller of the treasury to report any annual actuarial study of the medical assistance program and any participating managed care organizations and associated comments in electronic format to the finance, ways and means committees of the senate and the house of representatives, the office of legislative budget analysis, and the fiscal review committee of the general assembly. - Amends TCA Title 4; Title 56 and Title 71.

Sponsors


History

DateChamberAction
2020-01-14SenateAssigned to General Subcommittee of Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2020-01-08SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 1/14/2020
2019-04-09SenateAction deferred in Senate Commerce and Labor Committee to first calendar of 2020
2019-04-03SenatePlaced on Senate Commerce and Labor Committee calendar for 4/9/2019
2019-01-31SenatePassed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate Commerce and Labor Committee
2019-01-30SenateIntroduced, Passed on First Consideration
2019-01-29SenateFiled for introduction

Same As/Similar To

HB0158 (Crossfiled) 2019-04-09 - Action def. in Insurance Committee to First Calendar of 2020

Subjects


Tennessee State Sources


Bill Comments 750

feedback