TN SB0237 | 2021-2022 | 112th General Assembly
Status
Spectrum: Partisan Bill (Republican 1-0)
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-14 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Status: Introduced on January 19 2021 - 25% progression, died in chamber
Action: 2021-04-14 - Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee
Text: Latest bill text (Draft #1) [PDF]
Summary
As introduced, reduces the number of filing dates for campaign finance disclosures to quarterly in election years and semiannually in non-election years; requires all contributions and expenditures, no matter the amount, to be reported in detail. - Amends TCA Title 2, Chapter 10.
Title
AN ACT to amend Tennessee Code Annotated, Title 2, Chapter 10, relative to campaign financial disclosures.
Sponsors
History
Date | Chamber | Action |
---|---|---|
2021-04-14 | Senate | Assigned to General Subcommittee of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-13 | Senate | Action deferred in Senate State and Local Government Committee to 4/14/2021 |
2021-04-07 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 4/13/2021 |
2021-03-30 | Senate | Reset on Final calendar of Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-03-24 | Senate | Placed on Senate State and Local Government Committee calendar for 3/30/2021 |
2021-02-10 | Senate | Passed on Second Consideration, refer to Senate State and Local Government Committee |
2021-02-08 | Senate | Introduced, Passed on First Consideration |
2021-01-19 | Senate | Filed for introduction |
Same As/Similar To
HB0501 (Crossfiled) 2021-03-18 - Received from House, Passed on First Consideration